FL S1380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for establishing a quorum for meetings of certain agencies and councils when a voting member appears via telephone, real-time videoconferencing, or similar real-time electronic or video communication; requiring notice of intent to appear via telephone, real-time videoconferencing, or similar real-time electronic or video communication by a specified time, etc.
Title
Regional Agency and Regional Planning Council Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Transportation; Rules |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H611 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1380 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1380/BillText/Filed/HTML |