FL S1378 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that all local government stormwater management plans and programs incorporate the best management practices adopted by the Department of Environmental Protection and other local stormwater management measures; exempting local governments that adopted more stringent standards before a specified date, etc.
Title
Stormwater Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H751 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1378 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1378/BillText/Filed/HTML |