FL S1354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "felony offense"; providing for reclassification of certain felony offenses when the person who commits the offense crosses a county line with specified intent, etc.
Title
Traveling Across County Lines with Intent to Commit a Felony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/09/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H279 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules