FL S1344 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the permitted scope of local laws, ordinances, and regulations with respect to vacation rentals; providing an exemption for subsequent amendments of certain provisions of existing local laws, ordinances, and regulations adopted on or before a specified date, etc.
Title
Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0735 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1344 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1344/BillText/Filed/HTML |