FL S1340 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "care coordinator"; requiring certain school districts to be guided by and adhere to a specified mental health and treatment support system for certain children; requiring school districts to contract with managing entities to provide care coordinators for certain students; requiring school districts to address certain recommendations, and meet specified performance outcomes, etc.
Title
Coordinated Systems of Care for Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1169 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar