FL S1340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting the Florida Statutes 2018 and designating the portions thereof that are to constitute the official law of the state, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7021 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Substituted HB 7021 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7021 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-109
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 2421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1340 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1340/BillText/Filed/HTML |