FL H7021 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts Florida Statutes 2018 & designates portions thereof that are to constitute official law of state; provides that Florida Statutes 2018 shall be effective immediately upon publication; provides that general laws enacted during the June 7-9, 2017, special session & prior thereto & not included in the Florida Statutes 2018 are repealed; provides that general laws enacted after June 7-9, 2017, special session are not repealed by this adoption act.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#589 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#589 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-109 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1340 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1340 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7021
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 2421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |