FL S1322 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing tenants and mobile home owners who are defendants in certain eviction proceedings to file a motion with the court to have the records of such proceedings sealed and to have their names substituted on the progress docket under certain conditions; specifying that tenants and mobile home owners are entitled to such relief only once; requiring tenants and mobile home owners seeking such relief to serve a copy of the motion on parties to the proceeding and file a specified affidavit with the court, etc.
Title
Court Records of Eviction Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1131 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1322 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1322/BillText/Filed/HTML |