FL H1131 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes tenants & mobile home owners who are defendants in certain eviction proceedings to file motion with court to have records of such proceedings sealed & to have their names substituted on progress docket under certain conditions; requires court to grant such motions if certain requirements are met; requires court to substitute defendant's name on progress docket if judgment is entered in favor of defendant; provides retroactive applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court Records of Eviction Proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1322 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
83626Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback