FL S1320 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2023-105), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2023-105), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "sex"; prohibiting an employee, contractor, or student of a public school from being required to refer to a person using personal titles or pronouns that do not correspond with that person's sex; prohibiting classroom instruction by school personnel on sexual orientation or gender identity until grade 9; providing that such prohibition applies to charter schools; providing that materials used to teach reproductive health or any disease as part of certain courses must be approved by the Department of Education; requiring district school boards to adopt and publish a specified process relating to student access to certain materials, etc.
Title
Child Protection in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2023-105), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1069 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 14 NAYS 6 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-21 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1069 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Chapter No. 2023-105
H1223 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2023-105)
H5101 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-245; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), CS/CS/HB 633 (Ch. 2023-104), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2023-38), CS/CS/SB 240 (Ch. 2023-81)
H1223 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1069 (Ch. 2023-105)
H5101 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-245; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), CS/CS/HB 633 (Ch. 2023-104), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2023-38), CS/CS/SB 240 (Ch. 2023-81)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |