FL S1316 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Commerce And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain tickets may be sold as nontransferable tickets only under certain circumstances; providing exceptions; defining the term "nontransferable ticket"; prohibiting the original ticket seller from taking certain actions against a person who purchases or resells a ticket, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resale of Tickets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2021-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H969 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81736Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback