FL S1310 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that any release of an oral recording of a 911 emergency transmission be digitally modified in order to protect the personal identity of any person requesting emergency services or reporting an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

911 Emergency Telephone Calls

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/05/11, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 97
2011-03-07 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 97
2011-02-22 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
365171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback