FL S1296 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the requirement that the Florida Commission on Human Relations send certain information to certain persons by registered mail, etc.
Title
Florida Commission on Human Relations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1225 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar