FL S1278 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the court to order an offender convicted of an offense of child abuse to pay an assessment of a specified amount if the offender does not receive a state prison sentence; requiring that the assessment be allocated to the child protection team in the judicial circuit in which the alternative sentenced is imposed, etc.
Title
Sentencing Alternatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 140 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 140 | |
2011-12-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1278 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1278/BillText/Filed/HTML |