FL S1276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the prohibition of breed-specific local government regulation of dangerous dogs.
Title
Dangerous Dogs/Breed-specific Regulation [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-08 | Now in Agriculture -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-05 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-03-04 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Community Affairs (183800); YEAS 9 NAYS 2 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Agriculture; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00091; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Community Affairs; Agriculture; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2010-01-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0543 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC)