FL S1268 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to determination of noneconomic damages and limits on noneconomic damages, etc.
Title
Noneconomic Damages for Wrongful Death Suits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Health Policy; Rules |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
766 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1268 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1268/BillText/Filed/HTML |