FL S1268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring sheriffs to charge a uniform fee for service of process; requiring an employer, employee, or representative or agent of an employer to permit an authorized individual to make service on an employee in a private area designated by the employer; providing criminal penalties for persons failing to comply with the process; revising provisions relating to the address used for service on a registered agent; requiring the levying creditor to deliver to the sheriff an affidavit setting forth how to pay out moneys received under an execution sale, etc.
Title
Service of Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/13, 12:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1379 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
56 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
608 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 0485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 0487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |