FL S1264 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing the minimum amount of costs charged per case by state attorneys, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory Court Costs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced
2018-01-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-12-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1003 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
93827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback