FL S1256 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Cites this act as the "Capital City Aviation Fuel Tax." Authorizes a refund of the aviation fuel tax collected on aviation fuel purchased by certain commercial airlines in the state capital under certain circumstances. Specifies criteria. Provides for application of certain refund administration procedures. Prohibits application in certain municipalities. Prohibits implementation from reducing or otherwise adversely affecting certain aviation grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aviation Fuel Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 93
2011-03-07 Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 93
2011-02-21 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0593 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2069825Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback