FL H0593 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Capital City Aviation Fuel Tax Act"; authorizes refund of aviation fuel tax collected on aviation fuel purchased by commercial airlines in state capital meeting specified criteria; provides for application of refund administration procedures; prohibits application in any other municipality; prohibits implementation from reducing or adversely affecting aviation grants.
Title
Aviation Fuel Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 53 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 53 | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1256 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/593 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0593/BillText/Filed/HTML |