FL S1254 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring district boards to authorize bonds by a two-thirds vote of the members, etc.
Title
Community Development District Bond Financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Rules |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H851 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1254 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1254/BillText/Filed/HTML |