FL S1252 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses the legislative intent to revise laws relating to governmental effectiveness and efficiency.
Title
SSB/Governmental Effectiveness and Efficiency [GPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S --Temporarily postponed | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00090 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-01-20 | Filed |