FL S1244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring district boards to authorize bonds by a two-thirds vote of the members, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development District Bond Financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-20SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Rules
2019-02-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H641 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
190016Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback