FL S1242 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Transportation from contracting with certain entities for the provision of services related to the logo sign program; prohibiting the renewal of a contract entered into on or before a certain date which violates such provision, etc.
Title
Contracts for Logo Sign Program Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1242 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1242/BillText/Filed/HTML |