FL S1242 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Ratifying the proposed amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to equal rights for men and women, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Rights for Men and Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-05SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2021-12-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1589 (Similar To) 2022-01-16 - Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback