FL S1238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Class II railroad companies to develop critical incident stress plans in accordance with federal regulations, etc.
Title
Railroads
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1023 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1238 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1238/BillText/Filed/HTML |