FL S1236 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any public K-12 school, community college, or state university include on the inside cover of each of its publications certain information concerning the production and distribution of that publication.
Title
Publications Distributed by Public Schools, Etc. [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00089 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education Appropriations | |
2010-01-19 | Filed |