FL S1230 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Transportation to adopt rules; requiring that certain funds be used for specified purposes relating to the Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Grant Program, beginning in specified years; requiring the department to establish the Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Grant Program; providing for the distribution of grants to certain entities to install electric vehicle charging infrastructure; providing grant requirements, etc.
Title
Electric Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1346 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1221 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H1221 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
334 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 0802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 286 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
366 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1230 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1230/BillText/Filed/HTML |