FL S1228 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1275
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1275
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring amusement ride managers to meet certain requirements; revising standards for rules adopted by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services relating to amusement rides; removing the exemption from safety standards for certain museums and institutions; revising inspection standards for amusement rides, etc.
Title
Amusement Rides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1275 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1275 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/12/20 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/18/20, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1275 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-141