FL S1228 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing domestic and registered foreign limited liability companies to submit biennial reports to the Department of State; establishing a biennial report filing fee for limited liability companies; establishing a biennial report filing fee for domestic and foreign corporations, etc.
Title
Annual Business Organization Reports and Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H373 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 0114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
605 | 0909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
606 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 01401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 0705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 15101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 15315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 1909 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 81055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
620 | 9003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
622 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1228 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1228/BillText/Filed/HTML |