FL S1212 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State to serve as the state protocol officer; requiring that certain organizations provide notice of international travel to the Department of State, rather than the Department of Economic Opportunity; authorizing the Department of State to support the establishment of citizen support organizations for certain purposes; prohibiting the department from allowing a citizen support organization to use certain services, property, or facilities if the organization does not provide equal membership and employment opportunities, etc.
Title
International Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7049 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-93
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |