FL S1210 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the boundaries of the Estero Bay Aquatic Preserve, etc.
Title
Estero Bay Aquatic Preserve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H957 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee