FL S1210 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for consideration of time-sharing schedules or time-sharing arrangements as a factor in the adjustment of awards of child support; authorizing judges in family cases to take judicial notice of certain court records without prior notice to the parties when imminent danger to persons or property has been alleged and it is impractical to give prior notice; creating an exception to a prohibition against using evidence other than the verified pleading or affidavit in an ex parte hearing for a temporary injunction for protection against domestic violence, repeat violence, sexual violence, dating violence, or stalking, etc.
Title
Family Law
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2013-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (405224) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/13, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/13, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/13, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 2564 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 0485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |