FL S1208 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Postsecondary School-to-Work Program to be administered jointly by the State Board of Education, the Board of Governors, and the Department of Revenue. Provides that a student participating in the program earns course credit at a career center, Florida College System institution, or state university while employed as an apprentice with a private business in his or her field of study. Provides for a credit against the corporate income tax liability for a participating business, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School to Work

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 90
2011-03-07 Referred to Higher Education; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 90
2011-02-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0297 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback