FL S1206 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Right to Rock Act"; prohibiting public venue owners or operators from canceling certain live performances on specified bases; providing an exception; providing that venue owners or operators who violate the prohibition bear the costs enumerated in the related contract with the artist, performer, or musical group whose performance was canceled, etc.
Title
Live Performances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H15 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee