FL S1206 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the performance of certain transfer students, as measured by learning growth, may not be included in the performance evaluation of certain traditional public school personnel for a specified period, etc.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/18/13, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1206 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1206/BillText/Filed/HTML |