FL S1204 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating provisions requiring that bills that create a new criminal offense, modify an existing criminal offense, or modify the penalty for an existing criminal offense be referred, upon filing and before consideration, by the Office of Legislative Services to the Office of Economic and Demographic Research for preparation of a minority impact statement; authorizing the Office of Economic and Demographic Research to request the assistance of an executive agency in preparing the statement; requiring the executive agency to provide such assistance upon request, etc.
Title
Minority Impact Statements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1007 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H1303 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
H1303 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1204 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1204/BillText/Filed/HTML |