FL S1202 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating a specified period each year during which supervisors of elections are authorized to provide certain students with the opportunity to register to vote at school and with instruction on the elections process, etc.
Title
Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education Pre-K - 12; Rules |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0909 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1202 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1202/BillText/Filed/HTML |