FL S1198 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Emergency Management to identify and maintain an inventory of certain digitally displayed automatic changeable facing structures; redefining the term "missing endangered person"; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement, in cooperation with the Department of Transportation, the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, the Department of the Lottery, and local law enforcement agencies, to establish and implement the Purple Alert; authorizing local law enforcement agencies to broadcast information concerning certain missing adults, etc.
Title
Purple Alert
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H899 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
252 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |