FL S1198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding provisions with which charter schools are required to comply; revising requirements for school districts' reports to the Department of Education on certain costs; revising the requirements for data and information that district school boards must post on their respective websites; deleting a requirement that superintendents reduce certain expenditures under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Board Fiscal Transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback