FL S1198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability (OPPAGA) to conduct a study on the presentencing information provided to judges in this state and the manner by which that information is provided; requiring the Department of Corrections and the Office of the State Courts Administrator, upon request, to assist OPPAGA with the study, etc.
Title
Presentencing Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1198 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1198/BillText/Filed/HTML |