FL S1192 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Palliative Care and Quality of Life Interdisciplinary Advisory Council; providing for membership on the council; providing for staggered terms; requiring the Department of Health to provide staff, information, and other assistance as necessary to the council; requiring the department to establish a palliative care consumer and professional information and education program; requiring the department to publish certain educational information and materials about palliative care on the department website, etc.
Title
Palliative Care
Sponsors
Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
Sen. Anitere Flores [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0995 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee