FL H0995 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Palliative Care & Quality of Life Interdisciplinary Advisory Council & Palliative Care Consumer & Professional Information & Education Program within DOH; requires program to publish specified information; requires specified practitioners to provide seriously ill patients, upon request, with information about palliative care; requires specified facilities to comply with palliative care measures ordered by health care practitioners.
Title
Palliative Care
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Clelland [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Gwyndolen Clarke-Reed [D] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D] | Rep. Dave Hood [R] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1192 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/995 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0995/BillText/Filed/PDF |