FL S1184 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Economic Gardening Business Loan Program and the Economic Gardening Technical Assistance Program as permanent programs. Revises conditions under which loan agreements may provide borrowers with flexibility in meeting the projected number of jobs. Deletes a requirement that certain funds be deposited in the General Revenue Fund. Revises the date upon which the Office of Tourism, Trade, and Economic Development must begin to submit annual reports to the Governor and Legislature on the loan program and technical assistance program, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Gary Siplin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 89 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 89 | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0775 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1184 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1184/BillText/Filed/HTML |