FL H0775 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Economic Gardening Business Loan Program & Economic Gardening Technical Assistance Program as permanent programs; revises conditions under which loan agreements may provide borrowers with flexibility in meeting projected number of jobs; revises method for calculating servicing fee payable to loan administrator; deletes requirement that certain funds be deposited in General Revenue Fund; provides for use of funds; deletes obsolete provision authorizing adoption of initial emergency rules, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 66 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 66 | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1184 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/775 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0775/BillText/Filed/HTML |