FL S1176 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises membership requirements for the Board of Athletic Training. Revises requirements for licensure by examination for athletic trainers. Requires certification requirements for license renewal. Revises continuing education requirements for licensure renewal. Encourages school districts to employ or contract with certified athletic trainers at certain high schools in this state. Requires athletic trainers to be certified by the Board of Certification of the National Athletic Trainers' Association, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Athletic Trainers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-05 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/06/11
2011-05-04 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/05/11
2011-05-03 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11
2011-05-02 Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 --Removed from Calendar
2011-04-26 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469
2011-04-25 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 469
2011-04-20 Now in Budget -SJ 470
2011-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-12 CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 470
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2011-03-30 Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 323
2011-03-25 On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/30/11, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 88
2011-03-01 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 88
2011-02-17 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0831 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0763 () 2011-02-17 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 65

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
468711Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback