FL H0831 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Florida High School Athletic Association to conduct study related to need for athletic trainers in certain high schools & submit study's findings to Governor & Legislature by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Athletic Trainers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#356 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-03 Received -SJ 778
2011-04-28 In Messages
2011-04-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 871
2011-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11
2011-04-21 Original reference(s) removed: Health and Human Services Committee
2011-04-20 CS/CS by Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 740
2011-04-18 PCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/20/11, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2011-04-07 CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 586
2011-04-08 Original reference(s) removed: K-20 Innovation Subcommittee
2011-04-07 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-06 CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 590
2011-04-04 On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 04/06/11, 8:00 am, 306 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 72
2011-03-03 Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 72
2011-02-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1176 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0763 () 2011-02-17 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 65

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101246Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback