FL S1174 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "eligible housing" to include housing for evacuees from a United States territory, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Affordable Housing Guarantee Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4205092Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback