FL S1168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act"; providing that a foreign country is to be treated as a state; authorizing a court of this state to request a court of another state to conduct certain activities; providing rules for when a petition for the appointment of a guardian is filed in this state and in another state, etc.
Title
Guardianships and Protective Proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H677 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
744 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1168 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1168/BillText/Filed/HTML |