FL S1164 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising eligibility requirements for the Gardiner Scholarship Program; revising an authorized use of scholarship funds; providing that scholarship funds may be spent for tuition and fees associated with programs relating to art, music, or theater; revising terms under which a student's scholarship account is closed and program funds revert to the state, etc.
Title
Gardiner Scholarship
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95